This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 11/16/2021 at 15:34:23 (UTC).

PULTE HOME COMPANY LLC et al.vs.BATTERBEE ROOFING INC et al.

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 PULTE HOME COMPANY LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against BATTERBEE ROOFING INC. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Reginald K Whitehead. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************12-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Reginald K Whitehead

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PULTE HOME COMPANY LLC

CENTEX HOMES

Defendants

M AND MR OPERATIONS INC

TRADEWINDS GROUP OF CENTRAL FL INC

AMERICAN BUILDERS INSURANCE COMPANY

UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON

BATTERBEE ROOFING INC

A AND B STUCCO INC

C STERLING QUALITY ROOFING INC

DIVERSIFIED WINDOW SOLUTIONS INC

GARCIA CONCRETE AND LAYOUT INC

LEGENDS PAINTING SERVICE LLC

RUSSO AND SONS INC AKA

PROBUILD COMPANY LLC

PROFESSIONAL SUNSHINE ROOFING INC

SEVAN PLASTERING INC

GB PAINTING AKA

VFS SERVICES LLC

VISIONAIRE WINDOWS LLC

ASSOCIATION INSURANCE COMPANY AKA

19 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AMANDA ANDERSON

Defendant Attorneys

LOGAN HAINE-ROBERTS

ARMANDO RUBIO

Other Attorneys

JORGE MAZA

FAY RYAN

CANDY MESSERSMITH

 

Court Documents

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Alias Summons Issued

Alias Summons Issued; Comments: emailed atty

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses; Comments: TO COMPLAINT

Order

Order; Comments: on Parties Stipulation on Defts United Fire & Casualty Co Motion to Strike

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss; Comments: PLAINTIFFS PULTE HOME COMPANY LLC AND CENTEX HOMES COMPLAINT AS TO PROBUILD

Stipulation

Stipulation; Comments: ON DEFENDANT S, UNITED FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY, MOTION TO STRIKE

Correspondence

Correspondence

Letter

Letter; Comments: leonardo alfredo diaz

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: NATIONAL TRUST

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: GEMINI

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

99 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAlias Summons Issued; Comments: emailed atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses; Comments: TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
102 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 800.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VISIONAIRE WINDOWS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GCL, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BATTERBEE ROOFING INC is a litigant