This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 02/21/2022 at 23:27:16 (UTC).

PULTE HOME COMPANY LLC et al.vs.A & B STUCCO INC et al.

Case Summary

On 07/15/2021 PULTE HOME COMPANY LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against A B STUCCO INC. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey L Ashton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************34-O

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Jeffrey L Ashton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CENTEX REAL ESTATE COMPANY LLC

PULTE HOME COMPANY LLC

CENTEX REAL ESTATE CORPORATION AKA

Defendants

AMERICAN BUILDERS INSURANCE COMPANY

CLEAR BLUE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

HOUSTON SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

TIG INSURANCE COMPANY

BRADY BILT INC

HUGH MACDONALD CONSTRUCTION INC

SUPERB ROOFING INC

ASSOCIATION INSURANCE COMPANY AKA

THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY

MAIDEN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AKA

COLONY INSURANCE COMPANY

GEMINI INSURANCE COMPANY

GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY

NAXOS INSURANCE COMPANY AKA

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AMANDA ANDERSON

 

Court Documents

Notice of Dropping Parties

Notice of Dropping Parties; Comments: DEFENDANT TIG INSURANCE CORPORATION, AS TO ITS POLICY ISSUED TO K&B DRYWALL AND PAINTING SERVICES LLC ONLY

Return of Service of Summons

Return of Service of Summons; Comments: SERVED- V.F.S. SERVICES, LLC - 11/15/2021

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: K & B DRYWALL AND PAINTING SERVICES, LLC- 11/16/2021

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: BRADY BILT, INC - 11/22/2021

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Summons Issued

Summons Issued; Comments: Emailed to attorney

Summons Issued

Summons Issued

Summons Issued

Summons Issued

Summons Issued

Summons Issued

Summons Issued

Summons Issued

Summons Issued

Summons Issued

Summons Issued

Summons Issued

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s); Comments: 27

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: EXHIBIT NUMBER 27

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Dropping Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Dropping Parties; Comments: DEFENDANT TIG INSURANCE CORPORATION, AS TO ITS POLICY ISSUED TO K&B DRYWALL AND PAINTING SERVICES LLC ONLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service of Summons; Comments: SERVED- V.F.S. SERVICES, LLC - 11/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: K & B DRYWALL AND PAINTING SERVICES, LLC- 11/16/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: BRADY BILT, INC - 11/22/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketService Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: Per Admin Order No. 2021-04, a Standing Case Management Plan/Order for Streamlined or General civil cases must be submitted before summonses can be issued. Case management order should be signed by judge. Please resubmit the proposed summons along with the Case management Order.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: ANDERSON, AMANDA KAYE; Amount: -80.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 80.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Plan/Order - General Track

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketService Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: Per Admin Order No. 2021-04, a Standing Case Management Plan/Order for Streamlined or General civil cases must be submitted at time of filing.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Mark Boyle; Amount: -637.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 637.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRADY BUILT INC is a litigant

Latest cases where SUPERB ROOFING is a litigant

Latest cases where HUGH MACDONALD CONSTRUCTION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Clear Blue Specialty Insurance Company is a litigant