This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 10/04/2022 at 11:18:05 (UTC).

PROGRESS RESIDENTIAL BORROWER 5 LLCvs.GLENN BEALE, HEATHER TRAMMELL

Case Summary

On 08/10/2022 PROGRESS RESIDENTIAL BORROWER 5 LLCvs GLENN BEALE, HEATHER TRAMMELL was filed as a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew Bain. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************90-O

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Andrew Bain

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROGRESS RESIDENTIAL BORROWER 5 LLC

Defendants

GLENN BEALE

HEATHER TRAMMELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELIZABETH CRUIKSHANK

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Summons Issued 5 Day

Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: em atty

Summons Issued 5 Day

Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: em atty

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: SERVED

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: served

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: SENT TO JUDGE

Order Setting Hearing

Order Setting Hearing; Comments: 9/12/22 @ 2:00 Pm

Order for Default

Order for Default

Affidavit of Non Military Service

Affidavit of Non Military Service

Motion for Default to Court

Motion for Default to Court

Certificate of Service

Certificate of Service; Comments: OF ORDER FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2022
  • HearingHearing: Determination of Rent - Bain, Andrew (Actual: Bain, Andrew); Location: Video/Audio/Tele Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketHEARING - Determination of Rent - Bain, Andrew (Actual: Bain, Andrew)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Service; Comments: OF ORDER FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default to Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Non Military Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Setting Hearing; Comments: 9/12/22 @ 2:00 Pm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: SENT TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued 5 Day; Comments: em atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued 5 Day; Comments: em atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: CRUIKSHANK, ELIZABETH MARIE; Amount: -205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESS RESIDENTIAL BORROWER 5 LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELIZABETH CRUIKSHANK