This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 01/08/2023 at 15:57:45 (UTC).

PROGRESS RESIDENTIAL BORROWER 11 LLCvs.JOSE MONTERO FIGUEROA, AUREA BERNACET DUENO

Case Summary

On 11/09/2022 PROGRESS RESIDENTIAL BORROWER 11 LLCvs JOSE MONTERO FIGUEROA, AUREA BERNACET DUENO was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian Sandor. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************10-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brian Sandor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROGRESS RESIDENTIAL BORROWER 11 LLC

Defendants

JOSE MONTERO FIGUEROA

AUREA BERNACET DUENO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL DAVIS

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing; Comments: Proposed

Summons Issued 5 Day

Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: emailed atty

Summons Issued 5 Day

Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: emailed atty

Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing; Comments: SENT VIA SASE

Affidavit of Non Military Service

Affidavit of Non Military Service

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: posted

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: posted

Motion for Final Judgment

Motion for Final Judgment; Comments: default

Motion for Default

Motion for Default

Entry of Default as to 5 Day

Entry of Default as to 5 Day; Comments: emailed atty

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry of Default as to 5 Day; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Final Judgment; Comments: default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: posted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: posted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Non Military Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing; Comments: SENT VIA SASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued 5 Day; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued 5 Day; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Mike G Davis; Amount: -205.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 205.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing; Comments: Proposed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESS RESIDENTIAL BORROWER 5 LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVIS, MICHAEL