This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 08/13/2022 at 16:03:32 (UTC).

PROFESSIONAL IMAGING CENTERS INC vs. INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/14/2022 PROFESSIONAL IMAGING CENTERS INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth J Starr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************42-O

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth J Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PROFESSIONAL IMAGING CENTERS INC

MARILIE COLON-ROSARIO AAO

Defendant

INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHAD BARR

DALTON GRAY

Defendant Attorney

COURTNEY JONES

 

Court Documents

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: em atty

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Correspondence

Correspondence

Addendum to

Addendum to; Comments: CIVIL COVER SHEET

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL-PROFESSIONAL IMAGING CENTERS, INC

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Chad A. Barr; Amount: -90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL-PROFESSIONAL IMAGING CENTERS, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROFESSIONAL IMAGING CENTERS is a litigant

Latest cases where INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant