This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 03/08/2023 at 20:02:55 (UTC).

PREMIER PROMOTIONS USA INCvs.ALLIED WORLD ASSURANCE COMPANY US INC

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 PREMIER PROMOTIONS USA INCvs ALLIED WORLD ASSURANCE COMPANY US INC was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew L Cameron. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************47-O

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Andrew L Cameron

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PREMIER PROMOTIONS USA INC

STEVE S EXCAVATING & PAVING AAO

PREMIER 1 AUTO GLASS DBA

Defendant

ALLIED WORLD ASSURANCE COMPANY US INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IMRAN MALIK

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Addendum to

Addendum to

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Motion to Tax Costs

Motion to Tax Costs; Comments: AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT THEREOF`

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Tax Costs; Comments: AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT THEREOF`

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Imran Malik; Amount: -310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less