This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/03/2019 at 15:41:27 (UTC).

PREMIER PROMOTIONS USA INC vs. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/05/2018 PREMIER PROMOTIONS USA INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Eric H DuBois. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************26-O

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Eric H DuBois

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BARBARA STAYER AKA

PREMIER PROMOTIONS USA INC

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IMRAN MALIK

Defendant Attorney

ALEXANDER PECKHAM

 

Court Documents

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Stipulation

Stipulation

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY LYNETTE COLEMAN

Motion to Invoke Florida Rules of Civil Procedure

Motion to Invoke Florida Rules of Civil Procedure; Comments: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY,

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: Emailed to Atty

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • HEARING - CANCELED-Stipulation Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY LYNETTE COLEMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Invoke Florida Rules of Civil Procedure; Comments: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Demand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: Emailed to Atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Imran Ebrahim Malik; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less