This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 08/14/2022 at 16:12:56 (UTC).

PREMIER PROMOTIONS USA INC vs.PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/15/2022 PREMIER PROMOTIONS USA INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Carly S Wish. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************09-O

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Carly S Wish

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PREMIER PROMOTIONS USA INC

SUSAN WOODMAN AAO

PREMIER 1 AUTO GLASS DBA

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IMRAN MALIK

Defendant Attorney

ELISA MORALES

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: addendum

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Complaint

Complaint

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: em atty

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Motion for Protective Order

Motion for Protective Order; Comments: AND RENEWED MOTION TO STAY ANY AND ALL DISCOVERY

Objection

Objection; Comments: TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss; Comments: OR ALTERNATIVELY, DEFENDANTS MOTION TO ABATE OR STAY, AND COMPEL APPRAISAL, AND RENEWED MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND TO STAY DISCOVERY

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Comments: OR ALTERNATIVELY, DEFENDANTS MOTION TO ABATE OR STAY, AND COMPEL APPRAISAL, AND RENEWED MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND TO STAY DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketObjection; Comments: TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Protective Order; Comments: AND RENEWED MOTION TO STAY ANY AND ALL DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: em atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Imran Malik; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Comments: addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PREMIER PROMOTIONS USA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELISA MORALES