Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/03/2019 at 15:45:31 (UTC).

PREMIER PROMOTIONS USA INC vs. GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/05/2018 PREMIER PROMOTIONS USA INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Martha C Adams and Elizabeth J Starr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************70-O

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Martha C Adams

Elizabeth J Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PREMIER PROMOTIONS USA INC

FREDERICKA KINCADE AKA

PREMIER 1 AUTO GLASS DBA

FREDERICKA KINCADE AAO

Defendants

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IMRAN MALIK

Defendant Attorney

JONATHON STEPHENS

 

Court Documents

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DISCLOSURE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Stipulation

Stipulation

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: Emailed to Atty

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DISCLOSURE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • HEARING - CANCELED-Stipulation Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: Emailed to Atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Imran Ebrahim Malik; Amount: -90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PREMIER PROMOTIONS USA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Government Employees Insurance Company is a litigant