This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 03/08/2019 at 15:40:54 (UTC).

PREFERRED INJURY PHYSICIANS OF BRANDON INC vs. GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/07/2019 PREFERRED INJURY PHYSICIANS OF BRANDON INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Faye L Allen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************31-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Faye L Allen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AVINASH VIRAMUTHU AAO

PREFERRED INJURY PHYSICIANS OF BRANDON INC

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGORY GUDIN

Defendant Attorney

RICHARD LEVASSEUR

 

Court Documents

Answer

Answer

Summary of Proceedings

Summary of Proceedings

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DISCLOSURE, AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Change of Address

Notice of Change of Address

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: REGARDING RELATEDNESS AND MEDICAL NECESSITY

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: REGARDING WORKER S COMPENSATION

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: REGARDING SPORTS-RELATED INJURY

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: REGARDING RELATEDNESS AND MEDICAL NECESSITY

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT REGARDING UNDERWRITING AND POLICY FORMS

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: REGARDING UNDERWRITING

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions; Comments: REGARDING FEE SCHEDULE

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summary of Proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • HEARING - Pre-Trial Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DISCLOSURE, AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Appear Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Marc Salpeter; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less