This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 12/10/2021 at 15:35:51 (UTC).

PRADAXAY, PHENGSANITH vs. KENDRICK IV MD, JAMES Eet al.

Case Summary

On 10/11/2021 PRADAXAY, PHENGSANITH filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against KENDRICK IV MD, JAMES E. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey L Ashton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************76-O

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Jeffrey L Ashton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PHENGSANITH PRADAXAY

Defendants

JAMES E KENDRICK IV MD

FLORIDA HOSPITAL MEDICAL GROUP INC

ADVENTIST HEALTH SYSTEM SUNBELT INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDRES BEREGOVICH

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed attorney

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed attorney

Notice of Acceptance

Notice of Acceptance; Comments: service of process upon JAMES ERASMUS KENDRICK, IV, M.D

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: ADVENTIST HEALTH SYSTEM SUNBELT INC D/B/A ADVENT HEALTH ORLANDO

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: FLORIDA HOSPITAL MEDICAL GROUP INC D/B/A ADVENTHEALTH MEDICAL GROUP GYN ONCOLOGY ORLANDO

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss; Comments: DEFENDANTS JAMES KENDRICK, MD, ADVENTHEALTH MEDICAL GROUP GYN ONCOLOGY AT ORLANDO AND ADVENTIST HEALTH SYSTEM/SUNBELT, INC. d/b/a ADVENT HEALTH ORLANDO

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Comments: DEFENDANTS JAMES KENDRICK, MD, ADVENTHEALTH MEDICAL GROUP GYN ONCOLOGY AT ORLANDO AND ADVENTIST HEALTH SYSTEM/SUNBELT, INC. d/b/a ADVENT HEALTH ORLANDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: FLORIDA HOSPITAL MEDICAL GROUP INC D/B/A ADVENTHEALTH MEDICAL GROUP GYN ONCOLOGY ORLANDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: ADVENTIST HEALTH SYSTEM SUNBELT INC D/B/A ADVENT HEALTH ORLANDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Acceptance; Comments: service of process upon JAMES ERASMUS KENDRICK, IV, M.D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: BEREGOVICH, ANDRES I; Amount: -420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLORIDA HOSPITAL MEDICAL GROUP, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where ADVENTIST HEALTH SYSTEM SUNBELT INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BEREGOVICH ANDRES I