This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 09/07/2021 at 15:54:04 (UTC).

POWELL CHIROPRACTIC INC vs. PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 POWELL CHIROPRACTIC INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth J Starr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************13-O

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth J Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

POWELL CHIROPRACTIC INC

JEFFERY BREWSTER AAO

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN DALY

Defendant Attorney

JESSICA MARTIN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Summons Issued

Summons Issued; Comments: emailed to attorney

Addendum to

Addendum to

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued; Comments: emailed to attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: John Daly; Amount: -65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Powell Chiropractic, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JESSICA MARTIN