This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 11/21/2022 at 01:28:06 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLCvs.GIA BELLARD

Case Summary

On 09/21/2022 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLCvs GIA BELLARD was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian Sandor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************77-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brian Sandor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

GIA BELLARD

Orlando, FL 32818-6712

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MELISSA MCCALPIN

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed atty

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Order Following Pre-Trial Conference

Order Following Pre-Trial Conference

Summons Returned Unserved

Summons Returned Unserved; Comments: GIA BELLARD

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Alias Notice to Appear Scheduled

Alias Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2022
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Civil - Chalkley, Sara; Location: Video/Audio/Tele Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial; Location: Video/Audio/Tele Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Civil - Chalkley, Sara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAlias Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: FAGEN, JESSICA JO; Amount: -10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Unserved; Comments: GIA BELLARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Following Pre-Trial Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial (Actual: Civil, Pretrial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Civil - Chalkley, Sara (Actual: Civil, Pretrial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Jessica J Fagen; Amount: -310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCALPIN , MELISSA