This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 09/16/2022 at 15:43:55 (UTC).

POLANCO, ORLANDO RAMONet al. vs. STAPLETON, STEPHANIE ELIZABETHet al.

Case Summary

On 07/18/2022 POLANCO, ORLANDO RAMON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STAPLETON, STEPHANIE ELIZABETH. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is A James Craner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************48-O

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

A James Craner

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ORLANDO RAMON POLANCO

PERLA CASTELUCHE

Defendants

STEPHANIE ELIZABETH STAPLETON

NEW PRIME INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NATALIE MORALES

Defendant Attorney

ADAM KANTOR

 

Court Documents

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: SERVED 7-21-2022 NEW PRIME IN DBA PRIME INC

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Unavailability

Notice of Unavailability

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: SERVED 7-21-2022 NEW PRIME IN DBA PRIME INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Unavailability

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Daniel J. Newlin P.A.; Amount: -420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEW PRIME INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADAM KANTOR