This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 10/29/2021 at 16:54:45 (UTC).

PNC BANK NAvs.MARIA J ANTOUN

Case Summary

On 10/05/2021 PNC BANK NAvs MARIA J ANTOUN was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian F Duckworth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************69-O

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brian F Duckworth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PNC BANK NA

Defendant

MARIA J ANTOUN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONATHAN TEKELL

 

Court Documents

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: MARIA J ANTOUN

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Civil - Caraballo, Tina L; Location: Video/Audio/Tele Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Civil - Caraballo, Tina L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: MARIA J ANTOUN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Brett Burkett; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PNC Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JONATHAN TEKELL