Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/23/2021 at 03:06:24 (UTC).

PLATT CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC P A vs. ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/13/2020 PLATT CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC P A filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian F Duckworth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************80-O

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brian F Duckworth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALBRITTON CECIL AAO

PLATT CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC P A

Defendant

ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LUIS HUGUET

Defendant Attorney

ANTHONY PARRINO

 

Court Documents

Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel; Comments: PLAINTIFF S MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med; Comments: and Designation of Email Addresses

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed to attorney

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel; Comments: PLAINTIFF S MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil; Location: Room 130.02 on the 1st Floor Pre-Trial Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNot of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med; Comments: and Designation of Email Addresses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed to attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Neil Gonzalez; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PLATT MANAGEMENT INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUIS HUGUET