This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 02/02/2019 at 15:32:29 (UTC).

PHILIUS, MERIANAvs.FLORIDA MALL ASSOCIATES LTD et al.

Case Summary

On 12/04/2018 PHILIUS, MERIANAvs FLORIDA MALL ASSOCIATES LTD was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Kevin B. Weiss. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************27-O

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Kevin B. Weiss

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERIANA PHILIUS

Defendants

INTERSTATE CLEANING SERVICE COMPANY

FLORIDA MALL ASSOCIATES LTD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAUL SHALHOUB

Defendant Attorney

DANIEL MCLEOD

 

Court Documents

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Return of Service of Summons

Return of Service of Summons

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed to Atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed to Atty

Complaint

Complaint

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, INTERSTATE CLEANING CORPORATION, A FOREIGN PROFIT CORPORATION

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, FLORIDA MALL ASSOCIATES, LTD., A FLORIDA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT INTERSTATE CLEANING CORPORATION

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT THE FLORIDA MALL

Notice of Propounding Interrogatories

Notice of Propounding Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, INTERSTATE CLEANING CORPORATION

Notice of Propounding Interrogatories

Notice of Propounding Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, THE FLORIDA MALL

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: JURY TRIAL

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Return of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed to Atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed to Atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, INTERSTATE CLEANING CORPORATION, A FOREIGN PROFIT CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, FLORIDA MALL ASSOCIATES, LTD., A FLORIDA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT INTERSTATE CLEANING CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT THE FLORIDA MALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Propounding Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, INTERSTATE CLEANING CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Propounding Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, THE FLORIDA MALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: SHALHOUB, PAUL ROBERT; Amount: -420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 420.00

    Read MoreRead Less