This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/13/2023 at 15:35:14 (UTC).

PETERS, FRANKLINet al. vs. STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 PETERS, FRANKLIN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is A James Craner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************37-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

A James Craner

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FRANKLIN PETERS

ARLENE PETERS

Defendant

STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CASEY CLOUCHETE

Defendant Attorney

STEVEN CRUMBLY

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND EMAIL DESIGNATION

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice of Unavailability

Notice of Unavailability; Comments: JUNE 2-15, 2023

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DEFENDANT

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Unavailability; Comments: JUNE 2-15, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND EMAIL DESIGNATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: casey clouchete; Amount: -410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less