This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 10/29/2021 at 16:59:30 (UTC).

PERFECT EXPRESS RESTORATION vs.FARMERS INSURANCE

Case Summary

On 10/05/2021 PERFECT EXPRESS RESTORATION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FARMERS INSURANCE. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael Deen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************19-O

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Michael Deen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PERFECT EXPRESS RESTORATION

PAOLO MARRA AAO

ANNETTE LEIZAN AAO

Defendant

FARMERS INSURANCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDREW VARGAS

 

Court Documents

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim; Comments: NO PROPOSED

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketService Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: Per Administrative Order NO. 2009-12-02 Proposed 20 Day Summons needs to be submitted for issuance instead of a Proposed Notice to Appear. Per Admin Order No. 2021-04, a Standing Case Management Plan, Order for Streamlined or General civil cases must be submitted before summonses can be issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: VARGAS, ANDREW JOSEPH; Amount: -10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketService Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: Summons free not paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: VARGAS, ANDREW JOSEPH; Amount: -2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketService Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: NO PROPOSED SERVICE DOCUMENT PROVIDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Bridget Ortega; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FARMERS INSURANCE GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Vargas, Andrew Joseph