This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 01/26/2019 at 03:48:56 (UTC).

PEREZ CABRERA, MARIELVA vs. DE LOS SANTOS, KENDRICK LUIS

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 PEREZ CABRERA, MARIELVA filed a Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DE LOS SANTOS, KENDRICK LUIS. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey L Ashton. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************20-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Jeffrey L Ashton

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MARIELVA PEREZ CABRERA

Respondent

KENDRICK LUIS DE LOS SANTOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

RACHAEL CRAG-CHADERTON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2019
  • Affidavit of Service Returned Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Comprehensive Case History

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Comprehensive Case History

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Order Dismissing Injunction After Hearing Recorded

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Order Dismissing Injunction After Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Court Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Affidavit of Service Returned Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • HEARING - Injunctions - Bronson, Theotis (Actual: Bronson, Theotis)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Temporary Order/Final Hearing Injunction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Request for Confidential Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Notice of Social Security

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Notice of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less