Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 03/21/2021 at 16:14:24 (UTC).

PATH MEDICAL LLC vs. UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION AKA USAA

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 PATH MEDICAL LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION AKA USAA. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth J Starr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************09-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth J Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PATH MEDICAL LLC

DAVID GARRETT AAO

Defendant

UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION AKA USAA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGORY GUDIN

Defendant Attorney

BETH GORDON

 

Court Documents

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Service

Notice of Service; Comments: UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

Addendum to

Addendum to

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim; Comments: UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION AKA USAA

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service; Comments: UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Marc Salpeter; Amount: -90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Comments: UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION AKA USAA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Services Automobile Association is a litigant

Latest cases where Path Medical LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BETH GORDON