Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/15/2021 at 22:01:16 (UTC).

PATH MEDICAL, LLC vs. INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/29/2020 PATH MEDICAL, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Gisela T Laurent and Carly S Wish. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************35-O

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Gisela T Laurent

Carly S Wish

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FLORIDA INJURY LONGWOOD, LLC DBA

PATH MEDICAL, LLC

JOHANE FILOSSAINT AAO

Defendant

INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVID SPAIN

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S DISCOVERY TO DEFENDANT

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: on Infinity Indemnity Insurance Company.

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil; Location: Room 130.02 on the 1st Floor Pre-Trial Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S DISCOVERY TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNot of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: on Infinity Indemnity Insurance Company.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: David Spain; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Florida Injury Longwood LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Path Medical LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Infinity Indemnity Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID SPAIN