This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 06/08/2019 at 15:35:09 (UTC).

PARRAMORE, DAVID vs. SELECT PHYSICAL THERAPY HOLDINGS INCet al.

Case Summary

On 04/09/2019 PARRAMORE, DAVID filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against SELECT PHYSICAL THERAPY HOLDINGS INC. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Lisa T. Munyon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************05-O

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Lisa T. Munyon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVID PARRAMORE

Defendants

SELECT PHYSICAL THERAPY HOLDINGS INC

KATHLEEN C KLAPHEKE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMAS DELATTRE

Defendant Attorney

CHANEL MOSLEY

 

Court Documents

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: KATHLEEN C. KLAPHEKE, PT and SELECT PHYSICAL THERAPY HOLDINGS, INC.

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: affidavit of service on Kathleen C Klapheke PT

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: KATHLEEN C. KLAPHEKE, PT and SELECT PHYSICAL THERAPY HOLDINGS, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: affidavit of service on Kathleen C Klapheke PT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketDescription: Payment; Payer: Wieland Hilado & DeLattre; Amount: -420.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 420.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less