This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 02/12/2019 at 01:46:52 (UTC).

PACIFIC CONTINENTAL BANK vs. ORANGE DENTAL PAet al.

Case Summary

On 01/04/2017 PACIFIC CONTINENTAL BANK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ORANGE DENTAL PA. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Christi L Underwood and Chad K Alvaro. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************93-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Christi L Underwood

Chad K Alvaro

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PACIFIC CONTINENTAL BANK

Defendants

ORANGE DENTAL PA

CITY HALL DENTAL PL

ORLANDO FRIENDLY DENTISTRY PLLC

JOSEPH SHRAGER

ALLA SHRAGER

CHAMPION ORTHODONTICS PA

ORLANDO FAMILY DENTISTRY PL FKA

Receiver

GUIDEPOINT MANAGEMENT LLC

Intervenors

US BANK EQUIPMENT FINANCE DBA

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

CHOICE HEALTH FINANCE DBA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EARNEST DELOACH

Defendant Attorney

DAVID COHEN

Receiver Attorney

DANIEL ETLINGER

Intervenor Attorney

RONALD EMANUEL

 

Court Documents

Order

Order; Comments: appointing receiver

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Motion to Amend

Motion to Amend; Comments: Receiver Guidepoint Management LLc's emergency motion to amend order granting plaintiff's exparte emergency verified motion to appoint a receiver

Letter

Letter

Surety Bond Approved/Filed

Surety Bond Approved/Filed

Motion to Transfer

Motion to Transfer; Comments: CAUSE TO COMPLEX BUSINESS LITIGATION COURT; JOSEPH SHRAGER; ALLA SHRAGER

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Motion

Motion; Comments: TO APPROVE SALE OF PART OF COLLATERAL- AMENDED

Notice to Parties

Notice to Parties

Motion to Intervene

Motion to Intervene

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: affidavit of service

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: affidavit of service

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: WAIVER AND ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; CHAMPION ORTHODONTICS PA

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON ORANGE DENTAL PA

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON CITY HALL DENTAL PL

120 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Compel; Comments: and or for contempt by US Bank National Assoc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Court Minutes; Comments: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Court Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • HEARING - Motion - Alvaro, Chad K (Actual: Alvaro, Chad K)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Comments: COMPOSITE EXHIBIT 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Taking Deposition(s); Comments: 7/18/18 @ 11:30 am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Appear by Phone; Comments: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
133 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • Description: Payment; Payer: ETLINGER, DANIEL, Esquire; Amount: -12.49

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 3.99

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 8.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Description: Payment; Payer: DELOACH, EARNEST A.; Amount: -62.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 62.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Earnest A Deloach Jr.; Amount: -402.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 402.50

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank Equipment Finance is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EMANUEL ESQ, RONALD M