This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/11/2021 at 22:14:47 (UTC).

PACE, VERNON TYRONE vs. PACE, PATRICIA

Case Summary

On 06/19/2020 PACE, VERNON TYRONE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PACE, PATRICIA. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Diana M. Tennis. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************22-O

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Diana M. Tennis

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VERNON TYRONE PACE

Respondent

PATRICIA PACE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketDisposition Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketEvidence Control Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • HearingHearing: Uncontested Divorce - Rodriguez, Heather P (Actual: Rodriguez, Heather P); Location: Document Icon

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • HearingHearing: Dissolution; Location: Document Icon

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketExhibit(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketExhibit(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketExhibit(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketAnswer and Waiver

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketFinancial Affidavit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Under Uniform Child Custody Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketPetition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Limitation of Services Provided

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketCopy of Drivers License

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketAmended Administrative Temporary Order Provided to Customer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less