This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 01/28/2022 at 17:05:05 (UTC).

OVIEDO CHIROPRACTIC, LLCvs.PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/04/2022 OVIEDO CHIROPRACTIC, LLCvs PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy J Carter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************81-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Amy J Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

OVIEDO CHIROPRACTIC, LLC

JAMES DIGGS AAO

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JESSICA PICKERAL

Defendant Attorney

SARAH EDWARDS

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim; Comments: Progressive Select Insurance Company

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Addendum to

Addendum to

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Jessica Pickeral; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Comments: Progressive Select Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OVIEDO CHIROPRACTIC LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SARAH EDWARDS