This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 01/22/2022 at 16:22:41 (UTC).

OVIEDO CHIROPRACTIC, LLC vs. ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 OVIEDO CHIROPRACTIC, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Carly S Wish. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************64-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Carly S Wish

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

OVIEDO CHIROPRACTIC, LLC

SAMANTHA PARRISH AAO

Defendant

ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JESSICA PICKERAL

Defendant Attorney

ANTHONY PARRINO

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: addendum

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Email sent to attorney

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Email sent to attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Jessica Pickeral; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Comments: addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OVIEDO CHIROPRACTIC LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Insurance Company is a litigant