This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 03/20/2022 at 16:00:23 (UTC).

OVIEDO CHIROPRACTIC, LLC vs. ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 OVIEDO CHIROPRACTIC, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy J Carter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************91-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Amy J Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

OVIEDO CHIROPRACTIC, LLC A/A/O FILIP PAWELKA

OVIEDO CHIROPRACTIC, LLC

FILIP PAWELKA AAO

Defendant

ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JESSICA PICKERAL

Defendant Attorney

JAIRO LANAO

 

Court Documents

Privilege Log

Privilege Log

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: Ace American Insurance Co

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Addendum to

Addendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-02

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPrivilege Log

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: Ace American Insurance Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OVIEDO CHIROPRACTIC LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ACE American Insurance Company, a Pennsylvania corporation, and ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Co., a Pennsylvania corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JESSICA PICKERAL