This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/06/2023 at 01:39:07 (UTC).

OURTAAU, MICKAEL et al. vs. KB HOME ORLANDO LLC

Case Summary

On 09/07/2022 OURTAAU, MICKAEL filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against KB HOME ORLANDO LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey L Ashton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************53-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Jeffrey L Ashton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MICKAEL OURTAAU

AMANDA N OURTAAU

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff

KB HOME ORLANDO LLC

3Rd Party Defendants

A & B STUCCO, INC.

ADVANCED WRAPPING AND CONCRETE SOLUTIONS OF CENTRAL FLORIDA, INC.

M&D PROFESSIONAL PAINTING, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ERIK NUTTER

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorney

DANA CHAABAN

3Rd Party Defendant Attorney

ELIZABETH DROZ-STOLINAS

 

Court Documents

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Mediation

Notice of Mediation; Comments: 042723 9:30 am

Return of Service of Summons

Return of Service of Summons; Comments: on A&B Stucco Inc

Return of Service of Summons

Return of Service of Summons; Comments: on Advanced Wrapping & Concrete Solutions of Central FL

Return of Service of Summons

Return of Service of Summons; Comments: on M&D Professional Painting Inc

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Third Party Summons Issued

Third Party Summons Issued; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Third Party Summons Issued

Third Party Summons Issued; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Third Party Summons Issued

Third Party Summons Issued; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Third Party Complaint/Petition

Answer & Third Party Complaint/Petition; Comments: AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: K9HOME ORLANDO

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Mediation; Comments: 042723 9:30 am

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service of Summons; Comments: on A&B Stucco Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service of Summons; Comments: on Advanced Wrapping & Concrete Solutions of Central FL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service of Summons; Comments: on M&D Professional Painting Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Erik Carlton Nutter Jr.; Amount: -410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; Comments: TO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less