This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/04/2019 at 15:40:47 (UTC).

ORLANDO NEUROSURGERY AND ORTHOPEDICS INC vs. ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/06/2018 ORLANDO NEUROSURGERY AND ORTHOPEDICS INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are TBA 74 and Gisela T Laurent. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************84-O

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

TBA 74

Gisela T Laurent

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANTHONY POMMELLS AKA

ORLANDO NEUROSURGERY AND ORTHOPEDICS INC

Defendant

ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TODD LANDAU

Defendant Attorney

OLUWASEUN ADULOJU

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address

Notice of Change of Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: (SUPPLEMENTAL) REGARDING UNDERWRITING

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions; Comments: (PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL) REGARDING FEE SCHEDULE

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med

Notice to Appear Returned Served

Notice to Appear Returned Served; Comments: Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce; Comments: (SUPPLEMENTAL) REGARDING UNDERWRITING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Comments: (PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL) REGARDING FEE SCHEDULE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • HEARING - Pre-Trial Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Appear Returned Served; Comments: Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Appear Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Landau & Associates, P.A.; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less