This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 08/02/2022 at 16:11:26 (UTC).

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLCvs.GREGORY SEPULVEDA, JR

Case Summary

On 06/03/2022 ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLCvs GREGORY SEPULVEDA, JR was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew L Cameron. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************81-O

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Andrew L Cameron

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC

AS SERVICER FOR ("ASF") WILMINGTON TRUST, N.A.

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC SBM

ISSUER LOAN FOR ONEMAIN FINANCIAL TRST

Defendant

GREGORY SEPULVEDA JR

Orlando, FL 32809

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMAS LOBELLO

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: GREGORY

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Order of Dismissal

Order of Dismissal

Stipulation

Stipulation

Order Approving Settlement

Order Approving Settlement

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Approving Settlement and/or Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Approving Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Civil - Wish, Carly S (Actual: Wish, Carly S); Location: Video/Audio/Tele Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Civil - Wish, Carly S (Actual: Wish, Carly S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: GREGORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Thomas Lobello III; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AS SERVICER FOR ASF WELLS FARG is a litigant

Latest cases where ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES INC SBM is a litigant

Latest cases where ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC SU is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lobello, Thomas, III