This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 07/23/2022 at 15:59:15 (UTC).

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC vs.JOSE A MERCADO GONZALEZ

Case Summary

On 05/24/2022 ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JOSE A MERCADO GONZALEZ. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy J Carter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************68-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Amy J Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AS SERVICER FOR ("ASF") WILMINGTON TRUST, N.A

AS ISSUER LOAN TRUSTEE FOR ONEMAIN FINANCIAL ISSUANCE TRUST 2019-2

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. SBM

Defendants

JOSE A MERCADO GONZALEZ

Orlando, FL 32826

JOSE MERCADO GONZALEZ AKA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AMANDA ROLFE

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: em atty

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Order Following Pre-Trial Conference

Order Following Pre-Trial Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Following Pre-Trial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Civil - Pulayya, Juna (Actual: Pulayya, Juna); Location: Video/Audio/Tele Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Civil - Pulayya, Juna (Actual: Pulayya, Juna)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Amanda C Rolfe; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: em atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AS SERVICER FOR ASF WELLS FARG is a litigant

Latest cases where ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES INC SBM is a litigant

Latest cases where ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC SU is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROLFE, AMANDA CLAY