Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/14/2021 at 12:38:04 (UTC).

ONECARE SPINE AND INJURY CENTERS LLC vs.DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/03/2020 ONECARE SPINE AND INJURY CENTERS LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Gisela T Laurent and Carly S Wish. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************27-O

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Gisela T Laurent

Carly S Wish

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ONECARE DBA

ONECARE SPINE AND INJURY CENTERS LLC

ALAIRAY CLARK AAO

Defendant

DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GINA KIMMEL

Defendant Attorney

STEPHEN STRONG

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

Order Enlargement and Extension of Time

Order Enlargement and Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S DISCOVERY - Defendant, DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed to attorney

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Enlargement and Extension of Time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S DISCOVERY - Defendant, DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil; Location: Room 130.02 on the 1st Floor Pre-Trial Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed to attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Gina Kimmel; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ONECARE DBA is a litigant

Latest cases where Direct General Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen D Strong