This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 08/02/2022 at 16:00:54 (UTC).

OCEAN CHIROPRACTIC & HEALTH CENTER, INC. vs. ESURANCE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/03/2022 OCEAN CHIROPRACTIC HEALTH CENTER, INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ESURANCE PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian Sandor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************88-O

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brian Sandor

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

OCEAN CHIROPRACTIC & HEALTH CENTER, INC.

KIRA QUINTANA AAO

Defendant

ESURANCE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JESSICA PICKERAL

Defendant Attorney

PAULA MORRELL

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

Notice of Compliance

Notice of Compliance; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

Addendum to

Addendum to

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY- ELECTRONIC DELIVERY- 6/9/22

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY- ELECTRONIC DELIVERY- 6/9/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Jessica Pickeral; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Compliance; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OCEAN CHIROPRACTIC AND HEALTH CENTER, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant