This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/03/2019 at 15:33:33 (UTC).

NUVIEW IRA INCvs.3J ELLIS LLC et al.

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 NUVIEW IRA INCvs 3J ELLIS LLC was filed as a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Patricia L Strowbridge. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************68-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Patricia L Strowbridge

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NUVIEW IRA INC

FBO GLENN EARL BOWEN IRA 0710573 AKA

FBO GLENN EARL BOWEN IRA 0710573

Defendants

3J ELLIS LLC

METROWEST MASTER ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

METROWEST UNIT FIVE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

CAMEO DELOACH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHRISTOPHER HAMILTON

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Form "A"

Form "A"

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty Jim Drayton

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty Clayton & McCulloh

Certificate

Certificate; Comments: OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE

Lis Pendens

Lis Pendens

Value of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

Value of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

Answer

Answer; Comments: AND MOTION FOR MEDIATION (SENT TO JUDGE)

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

Answer

Answer; Comments: TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE AND CLAIM ON SURPLUS PROCEEDS

Order Setting Hearing

Order Setting Hearing; Comments: 4/2/19 8:30

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Setting Hearing; Comments: 4/2/19 8:30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer; Comments: AND MOTION FOR MEDIATION (SENT TO JUDGE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer; Comments: TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE AND CLAIM ON SURPLUS PROCEEDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty Clayton & McCulloh

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty Jim Drayton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Lis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Form "A"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: HAMILTON, CHRISTOPHER MARK; Amount: -10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Christopher M. Hamilton; Amount: -967.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 967.50

    Read MoreRead Less