This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 05/03/2022 at 15:40:43 (UTC).

NILLIUM HOLDINGS II LLC vs. NILLIUM HOLDINGS LLC

Case Summary

On 03/04/2022 NILLIUM HOLDINGS II LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against NILLIUM HOLDINGS LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Kevin B. Weiss. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************66-O

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Kevin B. Weiss

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NILLIUM HOLDINGS II LLC

Defendants

NILLIUM HOLDINGS LLC

ORANGE COUNTY FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEVIN RECK

Defendant Attorney

SHONDA WHITE

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Lis Pendens

Lis Pendens

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Value of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

Value of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed attorney

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed attorney

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: NILLIUM HOLDINGS LLC

Answer

Answer; Comments: TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT, CONSENT TO FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE, CLAIM FOR SURPLUS FUNDS AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS

Motion for Default

Motion for Default; Comments: Defendant, NILLIUM HOLDINGS LLC

Default Entered by the Clerk

Default Entered by the Clerk

Motion for Final Judgment

Motion for Final Judgment

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comments: Tuesday, April 26, 2022 at 8:30 AM,

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Final Judgment

Final Judgment

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2022
  • HearingHearing: Sale Date - Foreclosure, Sales; Location: Document Icon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketHEARING - Sale Date - Foreclosure, Sales

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • HearingHearing: Ex Parte - Weiss, Kevin B. (Actual: Weiss, Kevin B.); Location: Hearing Room 20-A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • HearingHearing: Ex Parte - Weiss, Kevin B. (Actual: Weiss, Kevin B.); Location: Video/Audio/Tele Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketHEARING - Ex Parte - Weiss, Kevin B. (Actual: Weiss, Kevin B.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketHEARING - Ex Parte - Weiss, Kevin B. (Actual: Weiss, Kevin B.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comments: Tuesday, April 26, 2022 at 8:30 AM,

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Kevin A. Reck; Amount: -1925.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 1925.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketValue of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Orange County Florida is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHONDA WHITE