This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 03/21/2022 at 16:01:39 (UTC).

NEXT MEDICAL FLORIDA, L.L.C vs. ASSURANCEAMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 NEXT MEDICAL FLORIDA, L L C filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ASSURANCEAMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth J Starr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************74-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth J Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NEXT MEDICAL FLORIDA, L.L.C

EBONY GRANT AAO

Defendant

ASSURANCEAMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JESSICA PICKERAL

Defendant Attorney

DINA PIEDRA

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Addendum to

Addendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-02

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: Electronic Delivery 01/24/22

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: Electronic Delivery 01/24/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Jessica Pickeral; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEXT MEDICAL FLORIDA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ASSURANCEAMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PIEDRA DINA O