This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/08/2023 at 05:34:12 (UTC).

NEWSOUTH WINDOW SOLUTIONS OF ORLANDO LLC vs. CORRADO, CHRISTINE R

Case Summary

On 11/16/2022 NEWSOUTH WINDOW SOLUTIONS OF ORLANDO LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CORRADO, CHRISTINE R. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Vincent Falcone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************24-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Vincent Falcone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEWSOUTH WINDOW SOLUTIONS OF ORLANDO LLC

Defendant

CHRISTINE R CORRADO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MELISA FERNANDEZ

Defendant Attorney

BRIAN GOTTLIEB

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Lis Pendens

Lis Pendens

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Complaint

Complaint

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s)

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: RETURN OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT CHRISTINE R CORRADO

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s); Comments: A - RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED AS TO CHRISTINE R CORRADO

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibit(s); Comments: A - RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED AS TO CHRISTINE R CORRADO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: RETURN OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT CHRISTINE R CORRADO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketService Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: Per Admin Order No. 2021-04, a Standing Case Management Plan/Order for Streamlined or General civil cases must be submitted before summonses can be issued. Please resubmit the proposed summons along with the Case management Order. Proposed summons against an individual must also be trilingual.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Marlowe McNabb Machnik PA; Amount: -410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibit(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibit(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibit(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibit(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibit(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLis Pendens

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less