This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 04/23/2023 at 15:34:43 (UTC).

NEWREZ LLCvs.BROWNSTEIN, SEAN et al.

Case Summary

On 02/22/2023 NEWREZ LLCvs BROWNSTEIN, SEAN was filed as a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Vincent S. Chiu. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************45-O

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Vincent S. Chiu

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NEWREZ LLC

SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING DBA

Defendants

SEAN BROWNSTEIN

BRIANNA BROWNSTEIN

SEAN ROSS BROWNSTEIN AKA

BRIANNA RAE OTTO AKA

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SEAN BROWNSTEIN AKA SEAN ROSS BROWNSTEIN

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BRIANNA BROWNSTEIN NKA BRIANNA RAE OTTO

DEERWOOD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF ORANGE COUNTY

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZACHARY ULLMAN

Defendant Attorneys

ROLAND ACOSTA

RYAN FONG

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint

Order Enlargement and Extension of Time

Order Enlargement and Extension of Time; Comments: to Respond to Complaint

Correspondence

Correspondence

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO THE PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to attorney

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Form "A"

Form "A"

Certificate

Certificate; Comments: of possession of original note

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Enlargement and Extension of Time; Comments: to Respond to Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO THE PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 980.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketForm "A"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate; Comments: of possession of original note

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketValue of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLis Pendens

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less