This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 02/27/2021 at 16:39:22 (UTC).

NEW SAINT MARK FREE METHODIST CHURCH vs. GUIDEONE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/06/2020 NEW SAINT MARK FREE METHODIST CHURCH filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GUIDEONE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are John Marshall Kest and Jeffrey L Ashton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************34-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

John Marshall Kest

Jeffrey L Ashton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEW SAINT MARK FREE METHODIST CHURCH

Defendant

GUIDEONE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMAS MORGAN

Defendant Attorney

REBECCA BROWNELL

 

Court Documents

Notice

Notice; Comments: OF SERVING VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Request for Documents

Request for Documents

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: and designation of email addresses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: Defendant, GuideOne National Insurance Company

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Correspondence

Correspondence

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Comments: OF SERVING VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: and designation of email addresses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: Defendant, GuideOne National Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Thomas J Morgan jr; Amount: -410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GUIDEONE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORGAN, THOMAS