This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 06/05/2022 at 17:05:45 (UTC).

NEUROSPINE INSTITUTE OF FLORIDA LLC vs. CENTURY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 NEUROSPINE INSTITUTE OF FLORIDA LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CENTURY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian Sandor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************82-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brian Sandor

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NEUROSPINE INSTITUTE OF FLORIDA LLC

DA-MIEK ISAIAH PARSONS AAO

Defendant

CENTURY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KERISSA NELSON

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Addendum to

Addendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-02

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: CENTURY-NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: CENTURY-NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Landau Associates, P.A.; Amount: -65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Century National Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KERISSA NELSON