Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/27/2021 at 21:53:40 (UTC).

NEUROSKELETAL IMAGING LLC vs. GEICO SECURE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/11/2020 NEUROSKELETAL IMAGING LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO SECURE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Tina L Caraballo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************88-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Tina L Caraballo

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NEUROSKELETAL IMAGING LLC

JAHAD BAKRCAMPBELL AAO

Defendant

GEICO SECURE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EDUARDO RODRIGUEZ

Defendant Attorney

SARAH TANYHILL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel; Comments: VERIFIED AND COMPLETE RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF S

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Memorandum

Memorandum; Comments: OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S DISCOVERY

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address; Comments: Primary and Secondary

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: (First)

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions; Comments: (First)

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: Addendum

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel; Comments: VERIFIED AND COMPLETE RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum; Comments: OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address; Comments: Primary and Secondary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; Comments: (First)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Comments: (First)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Comments: Addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEUROSKELETAL IMAGING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO Secure Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SARAH TANYHILL