This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/03/2019 at 15:31:52 (UTC).

NEILSON ENTERPRISES INC vs. NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 NEILSON ENTERPRISES INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Keith A Carsten. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************32-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Keith A Carsten

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NEILSON ENTERPRISES INC

LORAINE HARP & HATTIE MCCREE AAO

ORLANDO ROOFING DBA

Defendant

NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVID HEIL

Defendant Attorney

PATRICK BETAR

 

Court Documents

Petition or Motion to Strike

Petition or Motion to Strike; Comments: for extension of time.

Notice of Settlement

Notice of Settlement

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: DEFENDANT S SECOND

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Settlement

Notice of Settlement

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Complaint

Complaint

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition or Motion to Strike; Comments: for extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: DEFENDANT S SECOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: David R. Heil; Amount: -410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less