This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/03/2019 at 15:33:19 (UTC).

NATIONWIDE GENERAL CONTRACTING LLC vs. THE FIRST LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 NATIONWIDE GENERAL CONTRACTING LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against THE FIRST LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Luis F Calderon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************64-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Luis F Calderon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HEATHER AND SCOTT BEARNS AKA

NATIONWIDE GENERAL CONTRACTING LLC

HEATHER AND SCOTT BEARNS AAO

Defendants

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

THE FIRST LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ISABEL ARIAS

SEAN SCHULZ

 

Court Documents

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss; Comments: Defendant

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Unavailability

Notice of Unavailability

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: (AMENDED) AND EMAIL DESIGNATION

Complaint

Complaint

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint; Comments: & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: JURY TRIAL

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: Notice of Service of Process with Original Summons on Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND EMAIL DESIGNATION

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Complaint; Comments: & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Dismiss; Comments: Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: (AMENDED) AND EMAIL DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Unavailability

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Comments: Notice of Service of Process with Original Summons on Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND EMAIL DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Isabel Arias; Amount: -410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less