This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 06/03/2022 at 16:37:28 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLCvs.UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS et al.

Case Summary

On 05/10/2022 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLCvs UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS was filed as a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Paetra Brownlee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************33-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Paetra Brownlee

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

MR COOPER DBA

Defendants

UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS

CITY OF ORLANDO FLORIDA

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

COREY LEWIS

PRATIK PATEL

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Lis Pendens

Lis Pendens

Value of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

Value of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

Form "A"

Form "A"

Certification Settlement Authority

Certification Settlement Authority

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: CERTIFICATION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

Certificate

Certificate; Comments: OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed issued summon to the attorney

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed issued summon to the attorney

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed issued summon to the attorney

Affidavit of Diligent Search and Inquiry

Affidavit of Diligent Search and Inquiry

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: City of Orlando, FLorida

Affidavit of Non-Service

Affidavit of Non-Service; Comments: Unknown Heirs, Beneficiaries, Devisees, Assignees, Lienors, Creditors, Trustees and all others Who may Claim an Interest in the Estate of Elayne David

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: SERVED 5-19-2022 UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

Affidavit of Constructive Service

Affidavit of Constructive Service

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Action Issued; Comments: Emailed to the Atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Constructive Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: SERVED 5-19-2022 UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Non-Service; Comments: Unknown Heirs, Beneficiaries, Devisees, Assignees, Lienors, Creditors, Trustees and all others Who may Claim an Interest in the Estate of Elayne David

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: City of Orlando, FLorida

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Diligent Search and Inquiry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed issued summon to the attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed issued summon to the attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed issued summon to the attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Choice Legal Group; Amount: -935.00

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate; Comments: OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: CERTIFICATION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertification Settlement Authority

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketForm "A"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketValue of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MR COOPER is a litigant

Latest cases where Nationstar Mortgage, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEWIS , COREY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PATEL, PRATIK