This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 12/17/2021 at 16:40:01 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC vs. DAWSON, IDA MAEet al.

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against DAWSON, IDA MAE. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey L Ashton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************31-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Jeffrey L Ashton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY DBA

Defendants

IDA MAE DAWSON

THEARTIS DAWSON

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF SECRETARY OF

RICHMOND ESTATES NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAND DEVELOPMENT OBO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SARA COLLINS

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Notice

Notice; Comments: CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: NO ATTACHMENT

Notice of Confidential Information within Court Filing

Notice of Confidential Information within Court Filing

Notice

Notice; Comments: ORDER GOVERNING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND RESOLUTION

Form "A"

Form "A"

Notice

Notice; Comments: PLAINTIFF/LENDER S CONTACT INFORMATION

Notice

Notice; Comments: FROM THE COURT REGARDING LAWSUITS TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGES ON HOMES

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Value of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

Value of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

Lis Pendens

Lis Pendens

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketService Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: Per Admin Order No. 2021-04, a Standing Case Management Plan/Order for Streamlined or General civil cases must be submitted before summonses can be issued. Please resubmit the proposed summons along with the Case management Order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Sara B Collins; Amount: -967.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 967.50

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Comments: ORDER GOVERNING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND RESOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketForm "A"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Comments: PLAINTIFF/LENDER S CONTACT INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Comments: FROM THE COURT REGARDING LAWSUITS TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGES ON HOMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketValue of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nationstar Mortgage, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLLINS, SARA