This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/03/2019 at 15:33:25 (UTC).

MORALES COLON, CARLOS vs. SCHOOL BOARD OF ORANGE COUNTY FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 MORALES COLON, CARLOS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SCHOOL BOARD OF ORANGE COUNTY FLORIDA. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Kevin B. Weiss. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************66-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Kevin B. Weiss

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARLOS MORALES COLON

Defendant

SCHOOL BOARD OF ORANGE COUNTY FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAREN WASSON

Defendant Attorney

SHARON HENRY

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: SCHOOL BOARD OF ORANGE COUNTY, FLORIDA

Complaint

Complaint

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: JURY TRIAL

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: SCHOOL BOARD OF ORANGE COUNTY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Returned Served; Comments: SCHOOL BOARD OF ORANGE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Service; Comments: SCHOOL BOARD OF ORANGE COUNTY, FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: WASSON, KAREN REED; Amount: -420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 420.00

    Read MoreRead Less