This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 01/22/2022 at 15:33:36 (UTC).

MOLINA, JAVIERet al. vs. ST JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY INC

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 MOLINA, JAVIER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ST JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY INC. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Vincent Falcone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************75-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Vincent Falcone

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JAVIER MOLINA

DAWN MOLINA

Defendant

ST JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOGAN TEMPLETON

Defendant Attorney

DOUGLAS LAPOINTE

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Complaint

Complaint

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Correspondence

Correspondence

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTORNEY

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing

Return of Service of Summons

Return of Service of Summons; Comments: Served ST. JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: ST.JOHNSINSURANCE COMPANY,INC.

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: ST.JOHNSINSURANCE COMPANY,INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service of Summons; Comments: Served ST. JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Logan Christopher Templeton; Amount: -410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where St Johns Insurance Company is a litigant