This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 03/07/2023 at 12:48:38 (UTC).

MOLDCORP ENVIRONMENTAL LLC vs.AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/27/2022 MOLDCORP ENVIRONMENTAL LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew L Cameron. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************55-O

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Andrew L Cameron

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MOLDCORP ENVIRONMENTAL LLC

LARRY WASHINGTON AAO

Defendant

AMERICAN SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEVIN WEISSER

Defendant Attorney

ALAINE GREENBERG

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Addendum to

Addendum to; Comments: CIVIL COVER SHEET

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: em atty

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: To Respond to Complaint

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY REQUESTS

Notice of Settlement

Notice of Settlement

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Settlement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY REQUESTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: To Respond to Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: em atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Kevin Weisser; Amount: -185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less