Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 03/30/2021 at 15:48:19 (UTC).

MIRACLE CHIROPRACTIC & REHAB CENTER vs. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/29/2021 MIRACLE CHIROPRACTIC REHAB CENTER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth J Starr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************48-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth J Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MIRACLE CHIROPRACTIC REHAB CENTER

MIRACLE CHIROPRACTIC & REHAB CENTER

MARIE AURELUS AAO

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN DALY

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: Addendum

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: DALY, JOHN CHRISTOPHER; Amount: -10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketService Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: Per Admin Order No 2009-12-02, emailed to attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: John Daly; Amount: -65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Comments: Addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MIRACLE CHIROPRACTIC & REHAB CENTER, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daly, John